Garcia, Cesar Pantaleon (CPSO#: 65706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 895-5199
Fax: (905) 895-4033
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cesar P. Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Garcia ( CPSO# 65706 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
202 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 895-5199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CESAR PANTALEON GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996