Gardam, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 67431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St.
8th floor, East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035800
Fax: 4166035987
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000 Ext. 82101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gardam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gardam ( CPSO# 67431 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
9th Floor Munk Building-Suite 800
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW GARDAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993