Gareiw, Salah Hassan (CPSO#: 71889)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 01 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 1999 to 01 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017