Gargan, Martin Francis (CPSO#: 104890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin F. Gargan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gargan ( CPSO# 104890)

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
555 University Avenue
Suite S107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7980

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 26 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018