Garinther, Ross Grant (CPSO#: 59711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
APPLETREE MEDICAL GROUP
150 Katimavik rd
Kanata ON  K2L 2N2
Phone: (613) 592-6759
Fax: (613) 592-1024
Electoral District: 07

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 29, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ross Grant Garinther
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garinther to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Garinther has ceased practising medicine until such time as he has
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            As from March 29, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ross Grant Garinther,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garinther to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROSS GRANT GARINTHER
                                          ("Dr. Garinther")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Garinther, certificate of registration number 59711, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my practice.  I am aware of the College's concern about
                  protecting the public. I acknowledge the nature of the College's
                  concerns.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake that, within two (2) weeks of the
                        Effective Date, all of my medical records from that date forward
                        will be typewritten.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for four (4) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, every two weeks;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty-five (25) of my patient charts at
                              every meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        reassessment reports provided to the Clinical Supervisor by the
                        College and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (6) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that in making its determination that
                        I may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that
                        I sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and
                        limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing
                        re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
                        (20) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor as set out in sections (6)(f) and (g) above,
                        including returning a signed Appendix "A" within twenty (20) days,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(h) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        said term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Safe Opioid Prescribing Course
                              (including all webinars and workshop);
                  
                        (ii)  Documentation: Charting Medical Records eLearning Module
                              (CMPA)
                  
                        (iii) Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping
                              eLearning Module (CMPA)
                  
                        (iv)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        four (4) months of the Effective Date or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake that, approximately three (3) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the
                        Professional Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and
                        Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice (the "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment conducted under section (8) of this Undertaking and to
                        abide by the recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Garinther, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garinther, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (10)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Garinther's
                        practice. As a result:
                  
                        -     Dr. Garinther shall maintain typewritten medical records.
                        -     Dr. Garinther will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for four (4) months. 
                        -     Dr. Garinther will engage in professional education in
                              record-keeping.
                        -     Dr. Garinther's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Garinther, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Garinther, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (19)  I, Dr. Garinther, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who facilitates my completion of
                  the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Garinther, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of
                  my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Garinther, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 29, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ross Grant Garinther to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 29, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Garinther’s practice. As a result:

• Dr. Garinther shall maintain typewritten medical records.
• Dr. Garinther will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for four (4) months.
• Dr. Garinther will engage in professional education in record-keeping.
• Dr. Garinther’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)