Garisa, Padma Lata (CPSO#: 88111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nolin Center
Lower Level
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 675-2101
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Padma Garisa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Garisa ( CPSO# 88111 )

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 675-2100

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 2, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 3, 2017, Health Sciences North (HSN) notified the College that in February 2017, Dr. Padma Garisa agreed not to exercise her privileges within the OB-GYNE Department at HSN until an external review of Dr. Garisa’s practice had been completed.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADMA LATA GARISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARISA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2008