Garofeanu, Gheorghita Camelia (CPSO#: 90019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Nov 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2011