Garrido Olivares, Luis Eugenio (CPSO#: 85544)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - Resident - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011