Garzon, Philippe Michel (CPSO#: 79519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6613
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe Garzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Garzon ( CPSO# 79519 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6613

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5A 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE MICHEL GARZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010