Gasiorowska, Paulina Maria (CPSO#: 92037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 249-8111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paulina Gasiorowska Medicine Professional Corporation/Paulina Gasiorowska Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gasiorowska ( CPSO# 92037 )

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULINA MARIA GASIOROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASIOROWSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011