Gaspard, Henry Servantes (CPSO#: 72181)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2001