Gassas, Adam Alee (CPSO#: 77026)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2015