Gaudet, Marc (CPSO#: 90371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Gaudet Medicine Professional Corporation/Marc Gaudet Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gaudet ( CPSO# 90371 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC GAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUDET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2016