Gauthier, Jean-Claude (CPSO#: 86320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 828-2442
Fax: (613) 225-3652
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: (613) 256-8549
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

1910 Saint-Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Women's Health Breast Centre
Grimes Lodge - 5th floor
200 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JC Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gauthier ( CPSO# 86320 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Unit 29
1910 Saint-Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
170 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 828-2442

Business Address:
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Women's Health Breast Centre
Grimes Lodge - 5th Floor
200 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012