Gauthier, Nadine Mylene (CPSO#: 83671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501Smyth Road
CCW 1682
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8165
Fax: (613) 739-6727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier ( CPSO# 83671 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road
CCW 1682
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8165

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE MYLENE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2005 to 25 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 04 Mar 2012
Research Fellows - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008