Gavigan, Genevieve Marie (CPSO#: 95857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4298
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Health Services
801 King Edward Avenue
Suite N203
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: 613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gavigan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gavigan ( CPSO# 95857 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Suite N203
801 King Edward Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE GAVIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAVIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2017