Gavin, Claire Theresa (CPSO#: 83843)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2005 to 20 Nov 2006
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 20 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2007 to 18 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010