Gaviolli, Eduardo Luiz Cansian (CPSO#: 88849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 14 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade de Medicina de Taubate, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 64628
Fax: (905) 575-6362
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDUARDO LUIZ CANSIAN GAVIOLLI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GAVIOLLI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. GAVIOLLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GAVIOLLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GAVIOLLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GAVIOLLI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GAVIOLLI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Dec 2011 to 04 Mar 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019