Gazala, Khalid Walid George (CPSO#: 88318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Neurology
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6765
Fax: (905) 338-4372
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. W. Gazala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saeed ( CPSO# 97104 )
Dr. K. Gazala ( CPSO# 88318 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
2015 Kingsridge Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 827-3006

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID WALID GEORGE GAZALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Nov 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011