Gdalevitch, Perry (CPSO#: 90132)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011