Ge, Hong (CPSO#: 86899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Second Military Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Heritage Health Clinic
Unit 128
5970 Sixteenth Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-2967
Fax: (905) 471-0476
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hong Ge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ge ( CPSO# 86899 )

Business Address:
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone Number: (905) 604-7889

Business Address:
Unit 128
5970 16th Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Phone Number: (905) 471-2967

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HONG GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010