Gebeyehu, Yidersal Mellese (CPSO#: 82015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Jimma University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yidersal Gebeyehu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gebeyehu ( CPSO# 82015 )

Business Address:
New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIDERSAL MELLESE GEBEYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBEYEHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jan 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)