General, Stacey Nicole (CPSO#: 93066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY NICOLE GENERAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENERAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2013