Gengatharan, Nirmala (CPSO#: 95352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 New Delhi drive Unit 78
Markham ON  L3S 0B5
Canada
Phone: 905-294-4489
Fax: 905-294-4479
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nirmala Gengatharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gengatharan ( CPSO# 95352 )

Business Address:
78 - 20 New Delhi Drive
Markham ON  L3S 0B5
Phone Number: (905) 249-4489

Business Address:
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Suite 9
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-5050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIRMALA GENGATHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENGATHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016