Gengsakul, Aungkana (CPSO#: 79871)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Khon Kaen University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004