Genier, Kim Christine (CPSO#: 95472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103-170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone: (905) 689-9499
Fax: 905-689-5289
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kim Genier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Genier ( CPSO# 95472 )

Business Address:
103 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 689-9499

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM CHRISTINE GENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015