George, Angela Ajit (CPSO#: 95561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
497 Laurier Avenue
Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone: 905 636 0023
Fax: 905 636 8388
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela A. George Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. George ( CPSO# 95561 )

Business Address:
8 - 497 Laurier Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 636-0023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA AJIT GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2015