George, Charles Frederick Petersen (CPSO#: 58709)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6860
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.F.P. George Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. George ( CPSO# 58709 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6860

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services Ltd 100 Piccadilly St London, ON N6A 1R8
Date Received: 20 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018