George, Rosamma (CPSO#: 78524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 3257
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSAMMA GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006