Gerard, Lauren Marie (CPSO#: 88800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka Regional
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: 7057395619
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN MARIE GERARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012