Gerber, David (CPSO#: 74111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 484-8383
Fax: (416) 481-4963
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gerber ( CPSO# 74111 )

Business Address:
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 484-8383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999