Germanus, Faten Shafik Andraous (CPSO#: 88796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone: (905) 257-5779
Fax: (855) 300-4761
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Square Medical Centre
14 - 2500 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: (905) 897-6729
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faten Germanus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Germanus ( CPSO# 88796 )

Business Address:
Huron Square Medical Centre
Suite 14
2500 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Phone Number: (905) 897-6160

Business Address:
Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
479 Dundas Street West
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 257-5779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEN SHAFIK ANDRAOUS GERMANUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMANUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2015