Gershater, Elize (CPSO#: 72166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Samoan

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Fax: (416) 530-6025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017


Corporation Name: Gershater Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gershater ( CPSO# 72166 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZE GERSHATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSHATER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000