Gershon, Sydney Lewis (CPSO#: 20844)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 30 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Apr-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1967
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 30 Apr 2018