Gerstein, Francine Hynda (CPSO#: 71489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1942 Avenue Road
North York ON  M5M 4A1
Phone: (416) 780-1100
Fax: (416) 780-1104
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 631-6888
Fax: (416) 631-6887
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francine Gerstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gerstein ( CPSO# 71489 )

Business Address:
1942 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 4A1
Phone Number: (416) 780-1100

Business Address:
CMH Medical Centre
1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 631-6888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCINE HYNDA GERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999