Gerth, Sjaan Christian (CPSO#: 88801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Centre
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C3R2
Phone: 6132282882
Fax: 6132282856
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sjaan Gerth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gerth ( CPSO# 88801 )

Business Address:
16 - 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SJAAN CHRISTIAN GERTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010