Getgood, Alan Martin John (CPSO#: 94154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine
3M Center
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-4003
Fax: (519) 850-2991
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Getgood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Getgood ( CPSO# 94154 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Centre
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-4003

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2010 to 18 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alan Martin John Getgood may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Orthopaedic Surgery, University of Western Ontario, in
                        which Dr. Getgood holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Getgood  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Getgood's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Getgood's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 11, 2012, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Getgood's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.