Gethamy, Manal Mansour Mezel (CPSO#: 90069)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Dec 2008 to 05 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010