Gevorkyan, Rafael (CPSO#: 94751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46 Adam Street
Cambridge ON  N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafael Gevorkyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gevorkyan ( CPSO# 94751 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
46 Adam Street
Cambridge ON  N3C 2K3
Phone Number: (519) 658-1413

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rafael Gevorkyan may practice medicine independently in family medicine.