Ghaddar, Rola (CPSO#: 108680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 May 2016 to 29 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018