Ghaderi, Iman (CPSO#: 85227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Arizona
Department of Surgery
PO Box 245066
1501 North Campbell Avenue
Tucson AZ  85724-5066
United States
Phone: (520) 626-2653
Fax: (520) 626-1411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMAN GHADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011