Ghadieh, Omar M M (CPSO#: 97083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room E6 102
Canada
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR M M GHADIEH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GHADIEH is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. GHADIEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GHADIEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GHADIEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GHADIEH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GHADIEH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 01 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019