Ghali Eskander, Mariam (CPSO#: 82534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Ghali, Mariam (used until: 30 Nov 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Ghali Eskander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghali Eskander ( CPSO# 82534 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM GHALI ESKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALI ESKANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011