Ghally, Gehan Rafaat (CPSO#: 69864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2A8
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Milio ( CPSO# 69836 )
Dr. G. Ghally ( CPSO# 69864 )

Business Address:
201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2A8
Phone Number: (519) 578-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEHAN RAFAAT GHALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 1996 to 24 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)