Ghandehari, Hournaz (CPSO#: 84625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 85189
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Ghandehari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOURNAZ GHANDEHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANDEHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011