Ghanny, Shari Alicia (CPSO#: 86341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: 905-497-2007
Fax: 905-840-0999
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
Oncology Clinic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shari Ghanny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghanny ( CPSO# 86341 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Oncology Clinic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6542

Business Address:
105 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-2007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARI ALICIA GHANNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011