Ghavamrassoul, Abbas (CPSO#: 71419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Jamestown Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shared Care c/o Woodgreen
650 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G5
Canada
Phone: (416) 645-6000 Ext. 1151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fung and Ghavamrassoul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fung ( CPSO# 76480 )
Dr. A. Ghavamrassoul ( CPSO# 71419 )

Business Address:
K302 - 650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 915-5460

Business Address:
St Jamestown Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3096

Business Address:
650 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G5
Phone Number: (416) 645-6400

Business Address:
5th Floor
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 978-1914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABBAS GHAVAMRASSOUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAVAMRASSOUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999