Gheorghe, Camelia Magda (CPSO#: 89902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Victoria St. W
2nd floor suite 307
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone: 705-250-8881
Fax: 705-250-8883
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

375 Magna Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 7L6
Canada
Phone: 905-726-7470
Fax: 905-726-7471
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

497 Laurier Ave Unit 9
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Canada
Phone: 905-203-0624
Fax: 289-270-2970
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Gheorghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gheorghe ( CPSO# 89902 )

Business Address:
375 Magna Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 726-7470

Business Address:
9 - 497 Laurier Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 203-0624

Business Address:
307 - 106 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone Number: (705) 250-8881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMELIA MAGDA GHEORGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHEORGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010