Gheshmy, Afshan (CPSO#: 95764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Afshan Gheshmy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gheshmy ( CPSO# 95764 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHAN GHESHMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHESHMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015