Ghobadian, Reza (CPSO#: 86296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: Ghobadian, Mohammad-Reza (used until: 14 Nov 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 18
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 240-2880
Fax: (905) 240-3880
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 2H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-0909
Fax: (416) 222-8292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ghobadian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghobadian ( CPSO# 86296 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 18
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-2880

Business Address:
80 Finch Avenue West
Suite 100
North York ON  M2N 2H4
Phone Number: (416) 222-0909

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA GHOBADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBADIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010